WOOD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: ERIC WOOD
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv14093
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from plaintiff setting forth contentions and arguments pursuant to Local Rule 9.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14)(PROTANO, EVELYN ROSE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN ROSE MARIE PROTANO on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (PROTANO, EVELYN ROSE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERIC WOOD. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service U S Attorney General, #2 Proof of Service U S Attorney Carpenito, #3 Proof of Service on General Counsel)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
June 24, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
June 21, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9759676), filed by ERIC WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOOD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: EVELYN ROSE MARIE PROTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC WOOD
Represented By: LAUREN S. TOVINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?