ADDISON v. ORTIZ

Petitioner: Alan Eugene Addison
Respondent: WARDEN ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2019cv14111
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to transfer action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/14/2019. cc: Addison. (RMM) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (CLK).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 3-03211) filed by Alan Eugene Addison. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) cc: NEF to petitioner (JLB) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 6/7/19. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADDISON v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Eugene Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?