PELLE v. REGAL IDEAS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PELLE
Defendant: Regal Ideas, Inc., JOHN DOE I-VIII, DIAL ACQUISITIONS PRODUCTS, REGAL ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC., NORMAN LIEFKO, TELESTEPS LIMITED, LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION, TELESTEPS, THE HARTFORD, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, HULTSTEG AB, TELESTEPS, INC., DIAL INDUSTRIAL SALES, INC., HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, TELESCOPIC WORLDWIDE INCORPORATED and TELESTEPS AB
Case Number: 1:2019cv14112
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Atlantic County Courthouse1201 Bacharach BoulevardAtlantic City, NJ 08401 State No: ATL L 1399 18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (rss, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Remanding case to State Court. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/9/2019. (rss, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Andrew S, Riso, Esq. re 5 Order,,,. (RISO, ANDREW)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion conference letter filed by Plaintiff Joseph Pelle on June 27, 2019 [Dkt. No. 4], asserting that this case should be remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey because 28 U.S.C. 1446(b) bars removal of this diversity suit which was commenced more than a year ago. Defendant Regal Ideas, Inc. has failed to address Plaintiffs letter within five (5) business days as required by Rule I.A of this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant Regal Ideas, Inc. shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court within three (3) business days: (a) why it has failed to timely respond to Plaintiffs pre-motion letter AND (b) why this case should not be remanded. If no response is filed, the Court will likely remand this suit. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/9/19. (ar1, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from joseph monaco. (MONACO, JOSEPH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE M. MARASCO on behalf of REGAL IDEAS, INC. (MARASCO, SUZANNE)
June 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
June 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Caption,Cause of Action,Jurisdiction,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/31/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/25/2019. (cry, )
June 25, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
June 21, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regal Ideas, Inc. from Atlantic, case number ATL-L-1399-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9760944), filed by Regal Ideas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing of removal, #2 Certificate of Service)(RISO, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PELLE v. REGAL IDEAS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Ideas, Inc.
Represented By: ANDREW S. RISO
Represented By: SUZANNE M. MARASCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-VIII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAL ACQUISITIONS PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGAL ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN LIEFKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HULTSTEG AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAL INDUSTRIAL SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESCOPIC WORLDWIDE INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PELLE
Represented By: JOSEPH MONACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?