EVDOKIMOW v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: DAVID EVDOKIMOW
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv14130
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Vera Varshavsky. (VARSHAVSKY, VERA)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by VERA VARSHAVSKY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (VARSHAVSKY, VERA)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER directing the United States to file and serve an answer to the 2255 Motion within 45 days, etc.; ORDERED that Movant may serve and file a reply to the answer within 45 days after the answer is filed, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/22/2019. (dmr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DAVID EVDOKIMOW. (HALPIN, JASON)
June 21, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-9761964.), filed by DAVID EVDOKIMOW. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Certification, #22 Certification, #23 Certification, #24 Certification, #25 Certification, #26 Certification, #27 Certification, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)Improper event used (Notified US Atty's office of filing) (dmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVDOKIMOW v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: VERA VARSHAVSKY
Represented By: MATTHEW J. SKAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID EVDOKIMOW
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?