HUPPERICH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. HUPPERICH
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv14210
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY with answer to complaint due within 60 days. (cry, )
June 27, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by ROBERT J. HUPPERICH.(cry, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the complaint etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/27/2019. (cry, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cry, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUPPERICH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. HUPPERICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?