ACOSTA v. VOORHEES DINER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Defendant: VOORHEES DINER CORPORATION and MARK KLEIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv14297
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; upon the parties' agreement that unpaid minimum wages and overtime back wages are owed and shall be paid to Defendants' employees for a total amount of $356,932.68, etc. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 8/6/2019. (dmr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA re #3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment (BIKLEN, MOLLY)
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Judgment)(BIKLEN, MOLLY)
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information,In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do not select "all plaintiffs" or "all defendants.". The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK KLEIN, VOORHEES DINER CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
June 26, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BIKLEN, MOLLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACOSTA v. VOORHEES DINER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: MOLLY K. BIKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOORHEES DINER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?