MEYER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: CATHERINE M. MEYER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv14517
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12)(FRITTS, HEATHER)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER TASHMAN FRITTS on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (FRITTS, HEATHER)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint,etc.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/2/2019. (ssp, n.m. )
July 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint entered by SAMUEL FISHMAN on 06/28/2019 was submitted with an Application for In forma pauperis (IFP). For future filings of complaints with an IFP application please use the event COMPLAINT RECEIVED, which can be found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (ssp, )
July 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
July 1, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
June 28, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (mmb, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by CATHERINE M. MEYER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Requested for Service on United States Attorney's Office, #3 Summons Requested for Service on Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #4 Summons Requested for Service on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region III, #5 Application IFP)(FISHMAN, SAMUEL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEYER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: HEATHER TASHMAN FRITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE M. MEYER
Represented By: SAMUEL FISHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?