RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: JEAN EMMANUEL RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC CITY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE, NEW JERSEY TRANSIT POLICE, ATLANTIC COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE, THE ATLANTIC CITY POLICE, THE SOMERS POINT POLICE, THE ATLANTIC CITY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, THE HAMILTON TOWNSHIP POLICE, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY JUSTICE FACILITY, THE COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, THE CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE and THE EGG HARBOR TOWNSHIP POLICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv14554
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
2 Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from JEAN EMMANUEL RODRIGUEZ re: address change. (cry, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler for all further proceedings. Judge Jerome B. Simandle no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/9/19. (dd, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that summons shall not be issued at this time as the court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman for Judge Simandle on 7/16/2019. (cry, )
July 15, 2019 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re #3 Application to Proceed IFP filed on 07/11/2019 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (dpw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JEAN EMMANUEL RODRIGUEZ. (cry, )
July 2, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/2/2019. (cry, notice & IFP sent)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC CITY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC COUNTY, NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC CITY POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SOMERS POINT POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC CITY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HAMILTON TOWNSHIP POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC COUNTY JUSTICE FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COUNTY OF ATLANTIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE EGG HARBOR TOWNSHIP POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN EMMANUEL RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?