REINAUER TRANSPORTATION COMPANIES, LLC v. M/T SEANOSTRUM
Plaintiff: REINAUER TRANSPORTATION COMPANIES, LLC
Defendant: MT Seanostrum, Valles Steamship Canada LTD, M/T SEANOSTRUM, VALLES STEAMSHIP (CANADA), LTD. and SEANOSTRUM TANKER LIMITED
Case Number: 1:2019cv14807
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated August 9, 2019 from Gino A. Zonghetti, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for September 26, 2019, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is October 9, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/12/19. (nar)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Gino A. Zonghetti. (ZONGHETTI, GINO)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/8/2019. (dmr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint in rem by M/T SEANOSTRUM.(DEGIULIO, FRANK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT (Verified) of Interest Pursuant to Rule C(6) and Rule E(8) Restricted Appearance of Seanostrum Tanker Ltd. with Attached Verification and Ex. A by M/T SEANOSTRUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DEGIULIO, FRANK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of sv MAS)(ZONGHETTI, GINO)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING SUMMONS AND WARRANT FOR ARREST for the M/T SEANOSTRUM entered on July 9, 2019, [Dkt. No. #4 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/23/2019. (dmr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Gino A. Zonghetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Letter from Britannia Steamship Insurance Association Limited)(ZONGHETTI, GINO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ***VACATED SUMMONS AND WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel or Other Property issued (dmr) Modified on 7/23/2019 (dmr, ).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Authorizing the Issuance of Warrant to Arrest. ORDERED that a Warrant of Arrest be issued against M/T SEANOSTRUM, etc.; ORDERED that the United States Marshal Services seize the Vessel, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/9/2019. (dmr)
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VALLES STEAMSHIP (CANADA), LTD., M/T SEANOSTRUM, SEANOSTRUM TANKER LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
July 8, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MT Seanostrum, Valles Steamship Canada LTD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9797415), filed by REINAUER TRANSPORTATION COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order Application for Ex parte Order, #3 Statement Rule 7.1, #4 Ex Parte order for Issuance, #5 Warrant for Arrest of Vessel)(ZONGHETTI, GINO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REINAUER TRANSPORTATION COMPANIES, LLC v. M/T SEANOSTRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REINAUER TRANSPORTATION COMPANIES, LLC
Represented By: GINO A. ZONGHETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Seanostrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valles Steamship Canada LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T SEANOSTRUM
Represented By: FRANK P. DEGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLES STEAMSHIP (CANADA), LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEANOSTRUM TANKER LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?