GERMINARIO v. RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: JUNE GERMINARIO
Defendant: RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC, RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., Account Management Systems, PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C., JOHN DOE(S) 1-100 and ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv15164
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER -- At the request of counsel it is hereby ORDERED the initial conference scheduled on September 4, 2019, is POSTPONED, to be rescheduled, if necessary, after plaintiff's motion to remand is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/3/19. (Schneider, Joel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Joseph M. Pinto, Esquire re #2 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (PINTO, JOSEPH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JUNE GERMINARIO re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(ABRUTYN, ELLIOTT) Modified filer on 8/1/2019 (cry, ).
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JUNE GERMINARIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Appendix to Pinto Declaration, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C.. (ABRUTYN, ELLIOTT)
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/12/2019. (cry, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/12/2019. (cry, )
July 11, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-628-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9808687), filed by RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Elliott Abrutyn, #2 Declaration Declaration of Steve Chaya, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(ABRUTYN, ELLIOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GERMINARIO v. RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC
Represented By: ELLIOTT ABRUTYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C.
Represented By: ELLIOTT ABRUTYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Management Systems
Represented By: ELLIOTT ABRUTYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE GERMINARIO
Represented By: JOSEPH MICHAEL PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?