TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND v. MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE
Case Number: 1:2019cv15417
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mt. Laurel Center for Rehabilitation and Healt Care, subsidiary of Centers Health Care. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mt. Laurel Center for Rehabilitation and Healt Care, subsidiary of Centers Health Care by TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A,B,C,D & E, #4 Certificate of Service)(FEEHAN, W.)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dmr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Default by TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND against Mt. Laurel Center for Rehabilitation and HealthCare, subsidiary of Centers Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(FEEHAN, W.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (FEEHAN, W.)
July 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
July 16, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES, TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND SAID FUND, AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (FEEHAN, W.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE, CENTERS HEALTH CARE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9818432), filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND SAID FUND, AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND v. MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. LAUREL CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?