BOYD v. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: BIANCA BOYD
Defendant: COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv15452
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIANCA BOYD. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE P. O'HEARN on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (O'HEARN, CHRISTINE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G. ANTINORI on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (ANTINORI, JOSEPH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 17, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
July 17, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820541) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BIANCA BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYD v. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIANCA BOYD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ALAN MACEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: CHRISTINE P. O'HEARN
Represented By: JOSEPH G. ANTINORI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?