Rollins v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Clyde Rollins
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, TORRENT PRIVATE LIMITED, EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, CVS HEALTH, A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC, NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OptumRx, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, CIGNA CORPORATION, WAL-MART INC., ACTAVIS LLC, PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AVKARE, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, HUMANA PHARMACY, INC., MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS, HETERO USA INC., MYLAN N.V., RITE AID CORP., Humana Inc, TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC, REMEDYREPACK INC., CARDINAL HEALTH INC., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., Northwind Pharmaceuticals, TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD, BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., Express Scripts Inc., HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, H J HARKINS CO., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., Acetris, LLC, THE KROGER CO., DOE DEFENDANTS, Optum Inc., MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. and SANDOZ INC.
In Re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv15708
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clyde Rollins. MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; MYLAN N.V. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; SANDOZ INC. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; THE KROGER CO. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service, #2 Summons Proof of Service, #3 Summons Proof of Service, #4 Summons Proof of Service, #5 Summons Proof of Service, #6 Summons Proof of Service)(MCGARTLAND, MICHAEL)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS ON AMENDE4D COMPLAINT ISSUED as to MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC., THE KROGER CO., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by Clyde Rollins as to MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC., THE KROGER CO., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCGARTLAND, MICHAEL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against DOE DEFENDANTS, MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC., THE KROGER CO., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed by Clyde Rollins.(MCGARTLAND, MICHAEL)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DOE DEFENDANTS, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., THE KROGER CO., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., SANDOZ INC., MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., filed by Clyde Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCGARTLAND, MICHAEL)
July 25, 2019 For all Case Management Orders #click here (dd, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, )
July 23, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00048. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Case transferred to District of District of New Jersey. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (KFB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT)-8). (KFB)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael P. McGartland on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde Rollins. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 07/11/2019. (KRS) Modified on 7/12/2019 (KFB). Serviced via US Mail to Michael McGartland.
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4017177.) filed by Clyde Rollins as to Clyde Rollins (KFB)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4017177.) by Clyde Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Holton, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael McGartland)(JCK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael McGartland)(JCK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael McGartland)(JCK)
July 2, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (JCK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys John Holton and Michael McGartland are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Michael McGartland)(JCK)
July 2, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-S Medication Solutions, LLC, Acetris, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Albertsons Companies, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp., Arrow Pharm Malta, Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Aurolife Pharma, LLC, Avkare, Inc., Bryant Ranch Prepack, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Camber Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cigna Corporation, DOE Defendants, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., H J Harkins Co., Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, Hetero Drugs, Limited, Hetero USA, Inc., Huahai U.S., Inc., Humana Pharmacy, Inc., Humana, Inc., Major Pharmaceuticals, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Laboratories, Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Myland, N.V., Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Nucare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Preferred Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., RemedyRepack, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Torrent Private Limited, UnitedHealth Group, Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4012331.), filed by Clyde Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Holton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollins v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PRIVATE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVKARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANA PHARMACY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REMEDYREPACK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwind Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO DRUGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H J HARKINS CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acetris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE KROGER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Rollins
Represented By: MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND
Represented By: John R Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?