SHAPIRO v. MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DENINE SHAPIRO
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. and JOHN DOES 6-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv16369
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 9/26/2019. (nar)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/12/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/26/2019. (rtm, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
August 13, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/30/2019. (rtm, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to MGM Resorts International.. (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/6/2019. (ssp, )
August 6, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 6, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. from Superior Court of Atlantic County, case number ATL L 001834 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9870420), filed by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAPIRO v. MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENINE SHAPIRO
Represented By: DANIEL T. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?