Collins v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Collins
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., AUROBINDO LTD. and DOES 1 through 10
In Re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv16387
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00688. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Files transferred electronically to: *District of New Jersey*.*Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse, 402 E. State St.**Trenton, NJ 08608* (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order MDL 2875) (jdt)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Granting in Part #6 Defendant's Motion to Stay. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to remand and grants in part Aurobindo USA's motion to stay. The case is stayed pending the JPML's final determination on whether this case should be transferred to MDL No. 2875. The stay will automatically lift upon the JPML's final order regarding transferring the matter to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/16/2019. (rmc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's "Class Action Complaint") by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Perkins, Roger) (rmc).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Order Taking Motions Under Submission: Defendant's #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Plaintiff's #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court are currently set for hearing on June 24, 2019. The Court finds these matters suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the hearings shall be taken off calendar. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on June 19, 2019. (no document attached) (jb1)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carrie Collins. (Lambert, Graham) (rmc).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Heinz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Fellenz, Kyle) (rmc).
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Carrie Collins. (Lambert, Graham) (rmc).
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 PRO HAC APPROVED: Ernest Frank Koschineg, III appearing for Defendants Aurobindo LTD., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jessica Margaret Heinz appearing for Defendants Aurobindo LTD., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12576043.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Koschineg, Ernest) Modified on 6/4/2019 (dsn).
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12576002.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Heinz, Jessica) (dsn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Upon due consideration and good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. APUSA must file its responsive pleading on or before 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/22/2019. (rmc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Responsive Pleading by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Perkins, Roger) Modified to correct event on 5/22/2019 (rmc).
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proof of Service)(Perkins, Roger)Attorney Roger G Perkins added to party Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (rmc).
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carrie Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 [proposed] order, #3 Proof of Service)(Lambert, Graham) QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order (rmc).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Upon due consideration and good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. Defendant Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. must file its responsive pleading on or before 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/23/2019. (rmc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Fellenz, Kyle) Courtesy QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order (rmc).
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Notice of Interested Parties). No Parties With Financial Interest. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fellenz, Kyle) (rmc).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-00013178-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12408999.), filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Kyle A. Fellenz, #3 Declaration Hunter Murdock, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-688-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(mme) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III
Represented By: JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ
Represented By: Roger G Perkins
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Fellenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO LTD.
Represented By: ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III
Represented By: JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Collins
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?