CALLEGARI v. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER CALLEGARI
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 and THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv16431
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2019. (sb)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 11/27/2019. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/10/2019. (tf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC.(TRATNYEK, JOHN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JENNIFER CALLEGARI by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TRATNYEK, JOHN)
August 7, 2019 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #3 submitted by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/28/2019. (ssp, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 10:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/7/2019. (ssp, )
August 7, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 7, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (TRATNYEK, JOHN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC identifying The Michaels Organization, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (TRATNYEK, JOHN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC from Superior Court of NJ, Camden County, Law Division, case number CAM-L-2552-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9875434), filed by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaince, #2 Certificate of Service)(TRATNYEK, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALLEGARI v. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC
Represented By: JOHN F. TRATNYEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER CALLEGARI
Represented By: DANIEL T. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?