RODRIGUEZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: I D W and DALIA RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, US ATTORNEY D. NEW JERSEY and OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL
Case Number: 1:2019cv16569
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DALIA RODRIGUEZ. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DALIA RODRIGUEZ. US ATTORNEY D. NEW JERSEY served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DALIA RODRIGUEZ. OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL served on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
August 13, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by DALIA RODRIGUEZ.(ssp, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/13/2019. (ssp, ).
August 13, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 12, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (ssp, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2019 to correct minor's name) (ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ATTORNEY D. NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I D W
Represented By: ADRIENNE FREYA JARVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALIA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ADRIENNE FREYA JARVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?