RUSH v. OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HOWARD RUSH
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC., JAMES DEVINE and REBECCA COOMEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv16733
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 11/29/2019. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/1/2019. (tf, )
September 25, 2019 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 10/1/19 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 8/15/19. (sb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by REBECCA COOMEY, JAMES DEVINE, OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC..(CALDWELL, AMANDA)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: By consent, the initial scheduling conference on 9/24/2019 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED. The Court has RESCHEDULED the initial scheduling conference for 10/1/2019 at 12:00 Noon. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/20/2019. (slc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from David Castellani, Esquire. (CASTELLANI, DAVID)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from counsel for Plaintiff [D.I. 5] requesting that the initial scheduling conference on 9/24/2019 be rescheduled. Counsel shall advise the Court in writing as to whether opposing counsel consents to the request. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/19/2019. (slc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from David Castellani. (CASTELLANI, DAVID)
August 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/15/2019. (cry, )
August 15, 2019 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #3 submitted by JAMES DEVINE, REBECCA COOMEY, OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC. on 8/15/2019 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/5/2019. (cry, )
August 15, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALDWELL, AMANDA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC. identifying Olympus Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALDWELL, AMANDA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JAMES DEVINE, REBECCA COOMEY, OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC. from Superior Court Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-1570-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9896779), filed by JAMES DEVINE, REBECCA COOMEY, OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(CALDWELL, AMANDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSH v. OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES DEVINE
Represented By: AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA COOMEY
Represented By: AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD RUSH
Represented By: DAVID R. CASTELLANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?