DANCO PAINTING, LLC v. VANISCO et al
Plaintiff: DANCO PAINTING, LLC and ABATETECH, INC.
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, TRI-STATE PAINTING, WELLS FARGO BANK, PNC BANK, GEORGE VANISCO and DANCO PAINTING
3Rd Party Defendant: GEORGE VANICSKO
Case Number: 1:2019cv16887
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motions (Dkt. Nos. #10 , #11 ) shall file an amended certified statement of each pro hac vice applicant "certifying that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the attorney in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorney in any jurisdiction." See L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/15/2019. (Solomon, D)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/9/2019. (dmr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Jeffrey R. Johnson, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, JEFFREY)
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Proposed Pretrial Order #18 filed by Jeffrey Johnson on 10/8/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Proposed Pretrial Order. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Letter and Proposed Order USING Letter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Pretrial Order by PNC BANK. (JOHNSON, JEFFREY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JOSEPH BASSO re #15 Scheduling Order. (dmr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JOSEPH BASSO re #14 Discovery Order. (dmr)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/27/2019. (dmr)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER regarding copies of checks and account statements. All other discovery as to these third-party defendants is hereby STAYED until the December 4, 2019 telephone status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/27/2019. (dm)
September 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 9/26/2019. (nar)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan by PNC BANK.(JOHNSON, JEFFREY)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/24/19. (nar)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard Thomson, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Schwartz. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard Thomson by WELLS FARGO BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William Reiley in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Richard Thomson in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Schwartz by WELLS FARGO BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William Reiley in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Amy Schwartz in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Exhibit to QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney, Charles J. Casale, Jr.,Esq by GEORGE VANISCO. (CASALE, CHARLES)
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Response #8 submitted by CHARLES J. CASALE, JR. on 9/6/2019 did not contain a proper signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE ONLY WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURE using the event EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT found under OTHER DOCUMENTS and link the submission to the response. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASALE, CHARLES)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASALE, CHARLES)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC BANK identifying The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (JOHNSON, JEFFREY)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. JOHNSON on behalf of PNC BANK (JOHNSON, JEFFREY)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 03:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/20/2019. (cry, )
August 20, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, State Court docket sheet indicating Plaintiff ABATETECH, INC. dismissed with prejudice by WELLS FARGO BANK. (cry, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WELLS FARGO BANK from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number BUR-L-2251-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9903815), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Exhibit I-J, #3 Certification of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANCO PAINTING, LLC v. VANISCO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-STATE PAINTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE VANISCO
Represented By: CHARLES J. CASALE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANCO PAINTING
Represented By: MARK S. KANCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANCO PAINTING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABATETECH, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH BASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GEORGE VANICSKO
Represented By: CHARLES J. CASALE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?