GAETANO v. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al
Plaintiff: FABIANA GAETANO
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, LISA DICKSON and INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv16891
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/8/2019. (sb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/9/2020 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 1/3/2020. Pretrial Factaul Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/8/2019. (tf, )
October 3, 2019 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 10/8/19 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 8/20/19. (sb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 25, 2019, shall be, and is hereby RESCHEDULED to October 8, 2019 at 2:00 pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/16/19. (sb)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff's counsel dated 9/13/2019 requesting an adjournment of the initial scheduling conference on 9/25/2019. Counsel shall advise the Court in writing as to whether opposing counsel consents to the request. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/13/2019. (slc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JOSEPH DEFIGLIO on behalf of LISA DICKSON, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC. (DEFIGLIO, DANIEL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. GIBSON on behalf of LISA DICKSON, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC. (GIBSON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS DIAZ on behalf of LISA DICKSON, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC. (DIAZ, DOUGLAS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by LISA DICKSON, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC..(DIAZ, DOUGLAS)
August 20, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/20/2019. (cry, )
August 19, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK from CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT (NJ), case number CAM-L-2131-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9903917), filed by INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS, #2 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(DIAZ, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAETANO v. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: DOUGLAS DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA DICKSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. GIBSON
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH DEFIGLIO
Represented By: DOUGLAS DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: DOUGLAS DIAZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. GIBSON
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH DEFIGLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABIANA GAETANO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN DELGAIZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?