COLON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: FRANCHESCA COLON
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv16934
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (cry, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP as set forth in September 4th Order #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the complaint #3 and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the complaint. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/26/2019. (cry, N.M.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by FRANCHESCA COLON.(cry, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk shall provide Plaintiff with a complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff is granted leave to file her proposed complaint etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/4/2019. (cry, notice and form mailed)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (No complaint form) (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(cry, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCHESCA COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?