STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY v. KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Defendant: KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv16969
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Joseph L. Pellis II, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/16/2019. (rtm, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #8 Motion for James F. Sweeney and Carole A.R. Rouffet Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/16/2019. (rtm, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon pre-motion letters, filed by Keymar Warehouse Company, Inc. [Dkt. No. 16] and Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. [Dkt. No. 18], regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss the complaint. To avoid unnecessary motion practice and conserve judicial resources, Plaintiff requests leave to file an amended complaint addressing some of the issues raised in Defendants pre-motion letter (this Court takes this opportunity to note that the arguments asserted in Defendants pre-motion letter would seem to suggest disputes over issues of material fact, more properly addressed on a motion for summary judgment). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted twenty-one (21) days to file an amended complaint. If Defendant still wishes to file a motion to dismiss in response to the amended complaint, it may once again proceed by filing a pre-motion letter in accordance with this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/16/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Val Wamser re #16 Letter. (WAMSER, VAL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Certification on behalf of STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (WAMSER, VAL)
October 6, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Defendant Keymar Warehouse Company, Inc.. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER extending the time within which Defendant may respond to the complaint to 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/3/2019. (rtm, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply for by KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Certification of Joseph L. Pellis II on behalf of KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC. Re QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney, #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
October 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Pro Hac Vice Motion #9 submitted by Joseph Hopkins on 9/16/2019 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATION WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rtm, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motion (Dkt. No. #8 ) shall file amended certified statements of the pro hac vice applicants certifying that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the attorneys in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorneys in any jurisdiction (Mr. Sweeney's Certification appears to be incomplete). See L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/01/2019. (Solomon, D)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Val Wamser, Esq.. (WAMSER, VAL)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Joseph E. Hopkins re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
September 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph E. Hopkins, #2 Certification of Joseph L. Pellis II, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Counsel)(HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Val Wamser, #2 Certification of James F. Sweeney, #3 Certification of Carole A.R. Rouffet, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Counsel)(WAMSER, VAL)
September 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/4/2019. (rtm, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The request for clerk's extension of time filed by Joseph Hopkins on 9/6/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE request for extension of time USING application for clerk's extension of time. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rtm, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC. identifying R. Markey & Sons, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH E. HOPKINS on behalf of KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC. (HOPKINS, JOSEPH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
August 21, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 20, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY identifying Starr Global Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WAMSER, VAL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9907153), filed by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY.(WAMSER, VAL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY v. KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYMAR WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH E. HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: VAL E. WAMSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?