RIVERS-VELEZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: JUAN RIVERS-VELEZ and JUAN RIVERA-VELEZ
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv17187
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER. ORDERED that he United States shall electronically file and serve an answer to the 2255 motion within 60 days, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/30/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
September 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice to Withdraw filed by MATTHEW J. SKAHILL on 9/18/2019 was submitted incorrectly. In the future, please use the event NOTICE TO WITHDRAW FROM NEF AS TO CASE found under NOTICES. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Notice of Withdrawal (SKAHILL, MATTHEW)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by JUAN RIVERA-VELEZ. (ssp, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 06-445, filed by JUAN RIVERA-VELEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Application IFP, #3 Memo in Support of IFP, #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #5 Interrogatories as to AUSA Wiener, #6 Interrogatories as to AUSA Carring, #7 Interrogatories as to Shapiro, #8 Interrogatories as to Hunter, #9 Motion for Discovery and Production of Docs, #10 Memo in Support of Motion for Discovery and Production of Docs, #11 Motion for Deposition, #12 Motion for Expansion of Record, #13 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #14 Envelope)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERS-VELEZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MATTHEW J. SKAHILL
Represented By: DIANA V. CARRIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUAN RIVERS-VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUAN RIVERA-VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?