MCADAMS v. TAYLOR et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL JAMES MCADAMS
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY and WARDEN KAREN TAYLOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv17800
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing without prejudice #1 habeas petition; Directing Clerk to close the case, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/28/2019. (rss, n.m.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/28/2019. (rss, n.m.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter re correspondence from MICHAEL JAMES MCADAMS. (rss, docket sheet and filing fee NEF sent )
September 16, 2019 Filing fee: $5, receipt number TRE105868 (abr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL JAMES MCADAMS. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCADAMS v. TAYLOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN KAREN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL JAMES MCADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?