BROADDUS et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: TILTON BROADDUS, MATTHEW FAGAN, PAUL FAGAN, NORMAN SWINDELL, JAMES SCOTT JR., SALIMAH JOHNSON, JAMES SCOTT, CHARLES TAYLOR, JUANITA JOHNSON, CHERYL CHANDLER, ROBYN MAYES, Ralph Fauntleroy and ROBIN MAYES
Defendant: HHS SECRETARY ALEX AZAR and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv17819
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, filed by Ralph Fauntleroy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Exhibit K-Q)(FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Granting request made by Defendant for a six month extension of time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/29/2019. (rtm, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from AUSA Frances Bajada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCES C. BAJADA on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (BAJADA, FRANCES)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, civil cover sheet, complaint, certification pursuant to L.Civ.R.11.2, lawyers referral list served on Craig Carpenito, US Attorney's Office on 09/19/2019, filed by TILTON BROADDUS, CHERYL CHANDLER, MATTHEW FAGAN, PAUL FAGAN, JUANITA JOHNSON, SALIMAH JOHNSON, ROBIN MAYES, JAMES SCOTT, JAMES SCOTT JR., NORMAN SWINDELL, CHARLES TAYLOR. (FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, civil cover sheet, complaint, certification pursuant to L.Civ.R.11.2 served on Department of Health and Human Services ATTN General Counsel on 09/18/2019, filed by TILTON BROADDUS, CHERYL CHANDLER, MATTHEW FAGAN, PAUL FAGAN, JUANITA JOHNSON, SALIMAH JOHNSON, ROBIN MAYES, JAMES SCOTT, JAMES SCOTT JR., NORMAN SWINDELL, CHARLES TAYLOR. (FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, civil cover sheet, complaint and certification pursuant to L.CIV.R.11.2 along with a lawyers referral list served on William Barr, Attorney General of the United States on 09/18/2019, filed by TILTON BROADDUS, CHERYL CHANDLER, MATTHEW FAGAN, PAUL FAGAN, JUANITA JOHNSON, SALIMAH JOHNSON, ROBIN MAYES, JAMES SCOTT, JAMES SCOTT JR., NORMAN SWINDELL, CHARLES TAYLOR. (FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALEX M. AZAR, II. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
September 13, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint,, civil cover sheet. (FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
September 10, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (bf, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by SALIMAH JOHNSON, CHARLES TAYLOR, MATTHEW FAGAN, ROBYN MAYES, JAMES SCOTT JR., CHERYL CHANDLER, JAMES SCOTT, TILTON BROADDUS, PAUL FAGAN, NORMAN SWINDELL, JUANITA JOHNSON as to All Defendants. (FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9952534), filed by SALIMAH JOHNSON, CHARLES TAYLOR, MATTHEW FAGAN, ROBYN MAYES, JAMES SCOTT JR., CHERYL CHANDLER, JAMES SCOTT, TILTON BROADDUS, PAUL FAGAN, NORMAN SWINDELL, JUANITA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(FRIEDMAN, SHAUNA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADDUS et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TILTON BROADDUS
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW FAGAN
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL FAGAN
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN SWINDELL
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SCOTT JR.
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALIMAH JOHNSON
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SCOTT
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES TAYLOR
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA JOHNSON
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL CHANDLER
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN MAYES
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Fauntleroy
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN MAYES
Represented By: SHAUNA LAUREN FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHS SECRETARY ALEX AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: FRANCES C. BAJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?