CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: Randy Wahlman, Deanna Wahlman, Jondy Chemicals, ServeCo North America LLC, SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC and JONDY CHEMICALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv17910
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONCERNING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/24/2019. (rss, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Clients with settlement authority shall be available via telephone. Counsel shall exchange and submit settlement memoranda directly to Judge Donio's Chambers at least one week prior to the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/24/2019. (slc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Allison L. Domowitch, Esquire re #17 Scheduling Order, Docket Annotation. (DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE: The parties shall submit their availability for a settlement conference. (See Scheduling Order [D.I. 17].) (slc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE:The parties shall make FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a) disclosures on or before October 22, 2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/8/2019. (rss, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: All proceedings in this civil action, including the pending motion to dismiss, shall be, and are hereby, stayed pending a settlement conference with the Court, except that informal discovery may be conducted as an aid to settlement. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/8/2019. (slc)
October 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/8/2019. (sb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for failure to state cause of action by SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Responses due by 10/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief support of cross motion, #2 Affidavit anthony milano, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAMER, TALBOT)
October 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for failure to state cause of action. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Discovery Plan by CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..(DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Exhibit to #12 Brief in Opposition to Motion by CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A-B)(DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JONDY CHEMICALS, INC., DEANNA WAHLMAN, RANDY WAHLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Index D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(GULASH, JESSICA)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/23/2019. (rss, )
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JONDY CHEMICALS, INC., DEANNA WAHLMAN, RANDY WAHLMAN. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit)(GULASH, JESSICA)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON LEIGH DOMOWITCH on behalf of CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC C. MILBY on behalf of JONDY CHEMICALS, INC., DEANNA WAHLMAN, RANDY WAHLMAN (MILBY, ERIC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Jessica M. Gulash, Esquire. (GULASH, JESSICA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MARIE GULASH on behalf of JONDY CHEMICALS, INC., DEANNA WAHLMAN, RANDY WAHLMAN (GULASH, JESSICA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRAMER, TALBOT)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/12/2019. (cry, )
September 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information is to be added for all Parties in a Notice of Removal,Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
September 11, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (bf, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ServeCo North America LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (KRAMER, TALBOT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ServeCo North America LLC from Superior Court of NJ, case number BUR-L-1692-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9956626), filed by ServeCo North America LLC.(KRAMER, TALBOT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN M. FLEISCHER
Represented By: ALLISON LEIGH DOMOWITCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Wahlman
Represented By: ERIC C. MILBY
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE GULASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Wahlman
Represented By: ERIC C. MILBY
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE GULASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jondy Chemicals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServeCo North America LLC
Represented By: TALBOT B. KRAMER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVECO NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: TALBOT B. KRAMER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONDY CHEMICALS, INC.
Represented By: ERIC C. MILBY
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE GULASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?