SAILERS et al v. BRANAGAN et al
Plaintiff: MARK EL, ROY SAILERS, KIONGOZI G. LUMUMBA and MARK SMITH
Defendant: RYAN BRANAGAN and RESIPRO COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv18059
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
October 10, 2019 #1 COMPLAINT against RYAN BRANAGAN, RESIPRO COMPANY with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROY SAILERS, KIONGOZI G. LUMUMBA, MARK EL.(rtm, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk shall open this case and file the complaint on the docket. ORDERED that the Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate this case, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/10/2019. (rtm, )(nm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/10/2019. (rtm, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. NEFs sent to ROY SAILERS (ssp, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by MARK EL, KIONGOZI G. LUMUMBA, ROY SAILERS. (rtm, )(nm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARK EL (cry, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ROY SAILERS (cry, )
September 19, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's IFP application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall close the case etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/18/2019. (cry, n.m.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Sailers IFP Application, #2 El IFP Application, #3 Lumumba IFP Application, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAILERS et al v. BRANAGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY SAILERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIONGOZI G. LUMUMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN BRANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESIPRO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?