ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY v. INTERMATIC, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 and INTERMATIC, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv18113
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: By consent, the initial scheduling conference on 10/29/2019 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. The Court has RESCHEDULED the initial scheduling conference for 12/11/2019 at 2:30 P.M. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/16/2019. (slc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Edmund Perry. (PERRY, EDMUND)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10 by INTERMATIC, INC..(PRIORE, PHILIP)
October 3, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer to Complaint #7 submitted by P. Priore on 10/2/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Intermatic, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10 by INTERMATIC, INC..(PRIORE, PHILIP)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Intermatic, Inc to answer the Complaint shall be extended to 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/2/2019. (tf, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (PERRY, EDMUND)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time for Answer by INTERMATIC, INC.. (PRIORE, PHILIP)
September 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
September 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint submitted by Edmund P. Perry appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ssp, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/19/2019. (ssp, )
September 19, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intermatic, Inc.. (PRIORE, PHILIP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Intermatic, Inc. from Superior Court of New Jersey Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-002225-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9974604), filed by Intermatic, Inc..(PRIORE, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY v. INTERMATIC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERMATIC, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP D. PRIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: EDMUND P. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?