UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CASSIDY PAINTING INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MARTIN CORP., LCR EMBEDDED SYSTEMS, INC., OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, CLEVELAND STEEL CONTAINER CORPORATION, TREX PROPERTIES LLC, NATIONAL CHEMICAL LABORATORIES OF PA., INC., WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY, THE, CASSIDY PAINTING INC., NATIONAL CASEIN OF NEW JERSEY, ATLANTIC ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, OCEAN YACHTS, INC., JOHNSON MATTHEY INC., POLYMERIC SYSTEMS INC., RECYCLE INC. EAST, LCR ELECTRONICS, INC., RICHLAND GLASS CO., INC., EXPERT MANAGEMENT INC., VP RACING FUELS, INC., INCINERATION RECYCLING SERVICES, INC., SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, THE, COATING DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC., ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY, DURAND GLASS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC, THERMOSEAL INDUSTRIES LLC, STEM BROTHERS, INC., UNITED ASPHALT CO., R.H. SHEPPARD CO., INC., PURITAN PRODUCTS, INC., LCRES HOLDINGS, INC., STRAIGHT ARROW PRODUCTS, INC., PRC-DESOTO INTERNATIONAL, INC., THE WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY and THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv18472
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/22/2019. (dmr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION/PETITION for entry of consent decree for by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (YU, ELIZABETH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATLANTIC ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, CASSIDY PAINTING INC., CLEVELAND STEEL CONTAINER CORPORATION, COATING DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC., CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, DURAND GLASS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC, EXPERT MANAGEMENT INC., INCINERATION RECYCLING SERVICES, INC., JOHNSON MATTHEY INC., LCR ELECTRONICS, INC., LCR EMBEDDED SYSTEMS, INC., LCRES HOLDINGS, INC., MARTIN CORP., NATIONAL CASEIN OF NEW JERSEY, NATIONAL CHEMICAL LABORATORIES OF PA., INC., OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, OCEAN YACHTS, INC., POLYMERIC SYSTEMS INC., PRC-DESOTO INTERNATIONAL, INC., PURITAN PRODUCTS, INC., R.H. SHEPPARD CO., INC., RECYCLE INC. EAST, RICHLAND GLASS CO., INC., ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY, STEM BROTHERS, INC., STRAIGHT ARROW PRODUCTS, INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, THE WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY, THERMOSEAL INDUSTRIES LLC, TREX PROPERTIES LLC, UNITED ASPHALT CO., VP RACING FUELS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
September 30, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 30, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Lodging of proposed Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - proposed Consent Decree)(YU, ELIZABETH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATLANTIC ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, CASSIDY PAINTING INC., CLEVELAND STEEL CONTAINER CORPORATION, COATING DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC., CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, DURAND GLASS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC, EXPERT MANAGEMENT INC., INCINERATION RECYCLING SERVICES, INC., JOHNSON MATTHEY INC., LCR ELECTRONICS, INC., LCR EMBEDDED SYSTEMS, INC., LCRES HOLDINGS, INC., MARTIN CORP., NATIONAL CASEIN OF NEW JERSEY, NATIONAL CHEMICAL LABORATORIES OF PA., INC., OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, OCEAN YACHTS, INC., POLYMERIC SYSTEMS INC., PRC-DESOTO INTERNATIONAL, INC., PURITAN PRODUCTS, INC., R.H. SHEPPARD CO., INC., RECYCLE INC. EAST, RICHLAND GLASS CO., INC., ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY, SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, THE, STEM BROTHERS, INC., STRAIGHT ARROW PRODUCTS, INC., THERMOSEAL INDUSTRIES LLC, TREX PROPERTIES LLC, UNITED ASPHALT CO., VP RACING FUELS, INC., WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY, THE, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YU, ELIZABETH)
September 27, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CASSIDY PAINTING INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCR EMBEDDED SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEVELAND STEEL CONTAINER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREX PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CHEMICAL LABORATORIES OF PA., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASSIDY PAINTING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CASEIN OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN YACHTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON MATTHEY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLYMERIC SYSTEMS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECYCLE INC. EAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCR ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHLAND GLASS CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERT MANAGEMENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP RACING FUELS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INCINERATION RECYCLING SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COATING DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAND GLASS MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERMOSEAL INDUSTRIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEM BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED ASPHALT CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.H. SHEPPARD CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURITAN PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCRES HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRAIGHT ARROW PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRC-DESOTO INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WORTHINGTON STEEL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ELIZABETH YU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?