THE HANSEN FOUNDATION, INC. et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Plaintiff: Rienna Rebetje, HANSEN HOUSE, LLC, THE HANSEN FOUNDATION, INC., JANE DOE and JOHN DOE
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv18608
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter from Jessica R. Witmer to Judge Donio regarding dispositive motion re #12 Order,, Scheduling Order,. (WITMER, JESSICA)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held on 11/13/2019. (sb)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONCERNING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/13/2019. (dmr)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/13/2019. (dmr)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 11/12/2019. (sb)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE: The telephone conference on 11/12/2019 shall convene at 11:45 AM. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME. (slc)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on the record on 11/5/2019. Hearing on oral application to stay discovery. Ordered application granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (dmr)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer to discuss a proposed resolution. The Court will conduct a Telephone Conference on 11/12/2019 at 12:15 PM, at which time the parties shall be prepared to discuss settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (dmr)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: By consent, discovery shall be, and is hereby, stayed pending a decision on the forthcoming dispositive motion. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (slc)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Keith A. Davis, Esquire re #6 Letter. (DAVIS, KEITH)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA R. WITMER on behalf of HANSEN HOUSE, LLC, RIENNA REBETJE, THE HANSEN FOUNDATION, INC. (WITMER, JESSICA)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY.(MURPHY, JOHN)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant City of Atlantic City's letter [D.I. 6], and will convert the initial scheduling conference on 11/5/2019 to a telephone conference. The telephone conference on 11/5/2019 shall commence at 11:30 A.M., and counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/31/2019. (slc)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from /on behalf of City of Atlantic City. (MURPHY, JOHN)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 11/5/19 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 10/3/19. (sb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/5/2019. (dmr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MURPHY, JOHN)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. NORCIA on behalf of CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY (NORCIA, ROBERT)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 12:00 PM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/3/2019. (cry, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY. (MURPHY, JOHN)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY from Superior Court of NJ-Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-002559-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10006852), filed by CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MURPHY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE HANSEN FOUNDATION, INC. et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rienna Rebetje
Represented By: KEITH ALAN DAVIS
Represented By: JESSICA R. WITMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANSEN HOUSE, LLC
Represented By: KEITH ALAN DAVIS
Represented By: JESSICA R. WITMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HANSEN FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: KEITH ALAN DAVIS
Represented By: JESSICA R. WITMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By: JOHN J. MURPHY, III
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?