MOORE v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: COREY MOORE
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv19107
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Amendment to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by COREY MOORE. (rss, )
October 21, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter; ORDERED that the Clerk shall forward Petitioner a blank 2255 form; ORDERED that, if Petitioner wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify the Court within 30 days, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/21/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ANDREW CAREY terminated. (CAREY, ANDREW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 18-0199 (NLH), filed by COREY MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COREY MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DIANA V. CARRIG
Represented By: ANDREW CAREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?