KERR v. AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN KERR
Defendant: AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20074
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/27/2020. (rss, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint until January 27, 2020.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE on behalf of AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN ANDREW KROCKER on behalf of KATHLEEN KERR (KROCKER, RYAN)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE ELAINE BURKE on behalf of KATHLEEN KERR (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN KERR. AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (KARPF, ARI)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 12, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10102322) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KATHLEEN KERR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KERR v. AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN KERR
Represented By: ARI R. KARPF
Represented By: RYAN ANDREW KROCKER
Represented By: CHRISTINE ELAINE BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?