BEAM v. TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Dawn Beam, Mr. Richard Beam, Jr., RICHARD BEAM and DAWN BEAM
Defendant: Township of Pemberton Chief of Police, JOHN DOES 1-10, Officer Lafferty, Officer Wolf, TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON, Pemberton Township Police Deprtment, Officer Rossetti and PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv20380
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rss, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:00 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/8/2020. (rss, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Separate Defenses by OFFICER LAFFERTY, PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICER ROSSETTI, TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON, TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON CHIEF OF POLICE, OFFICER WOLF.(GOLDSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Answer due within thirty (30) days from the date hereof, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/17/2019. (rss, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/10/2019. (rss, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Richard L. Goldstein, Esq. enclosing executed Consent Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Returns of Service #4 filed by MICHAEL S. DI CROCE on 12/6/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an Affidavit of Service. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document USING the appropriate SUMMONS RETURNED event found under SERVICE OF PROCESS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Summons and Cover Sheet served on Township of Pemberton et al on 11/25/2019, filed by RICHARD BEAM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff of Service Wolf, #2 Affidavit Aff of Service C.O.P., #3 Affidavit Aff of Service PTPD, #4 Affidavit Aff of Service PT, #5 Affidavit Aff of Service Lafferty)(DI CROCE, MICHAEL)
November 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OFFICER LAFFERTY, PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICER ROSSETTI, TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON, TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON CHIEF OF POLICE, OFFICER WOLF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dd, )
November 15, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (DI CROCE, MICHAEL)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10114950) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Richard Beam, Jr.(DI CROCE, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEAM v. TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Dawn Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Richard Beam, Jr.
Represented By: MICHAEL S. DI CROCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BEAM
Represented By: MICHAEL S. DI CROCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN BEAM
Represented By: MICHAEL S. DI CROCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Pemberton Chief of Police
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lafferty
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wolf
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF PEMBERTON
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pemberton Township Police Deprtment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rossetti
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: RICHARD L. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?