Richissin v. Camber, et al
Plaintiff: Fred Richissin
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, HETERO USA INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, CVS PHARMACY INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, HETERO LABS LTD, HUAHAI U.S. INC. and AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC
In Re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv20407
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Short Form Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (LAMBERT, MATTHEW)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, )
November 18, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13442. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2875. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ko)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2875. (ko)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan Ennis of Petition for Damages and Citation served on Solco Healthcare US, LLC on 10/31/19;answer due 11/21/2019 (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan Ennis of Petition for Damages and Citation served on Huahai US, Inc. on 10/31/19;answer due 11/21/2019 (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan Ennis of Petition for Damages and Citation served on Hetero USA, Inc. on 10/15/19; answer due 11/5/2019. (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan Ennis of Petition for Damages and Citation served on Camber Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/17/2019; answer due 11/7/2019.(Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan Ennis of Petition for Damages and Citation served on Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. d/b/a Solco Healthcare US, LLC on 10/31/2019;answer due 11/21/2019. (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pp).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma, LLC to #3 Order (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Godofsky, Evan) Modified text on 11/14/2019 to correct event (ajn).
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Directive Pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Clerk.(ajn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC, St. Tammany Parish, case number 2019-13601 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7938737) filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Evan J. Godofsky added to party Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Evan J. Godofsky added to party Aurolife Pharma, LLC(pty:dft).(Godofsky, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richissin v. Camber, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: QUENTIN F. URQUHART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO DRUGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: QUENTIN F. URQUHART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: QUENTIN F. URQUHART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI U.S. INC.
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: QUENTIN F. URQUHART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Richissin
Represented By: Stanley Paul Baudin
Represented By: JESSICA A. PEREZ
Represented By: MATTHEW PALMER LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?