SCHULMAN v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: HARRIET SCHULMAN
Defendant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH #10, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. and ABBOTT NUTRITION
Case Number: 1:2019cv21158
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Camden County Hall of Justice 101 South Fifth Street Camden, NJ 08103 State No: CAM L 4650 19. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (dmr)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REMANDING case to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, Docket CAM L 4650 19. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/19/2019. (dmr)
December 17, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ABBOTT NUTRITION, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/31/2019. (dmr)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (SIACHOS, PETER)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER GEORGE SIACHOS on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., ABBOTT NUTRITION (SIACHOS, PETER)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BALLOU, ROBERT)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jeffrey Thiel, Esquire. (GOLDBERG, SCOTT)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE by written submission, within 14 days, why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/9/2019. (dmr)
December 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences (KMW). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/9/2019. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences (RMB). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
December 6, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION identifying Costco Wholesale Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BALLOU, ROBERT)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION from Camden County Court House, case number CAM-L-4650-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10164092), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BALLOU, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHULMAN v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT A. BALLOU, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: PETER GEORGE SIACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT NUTRITION
Represented By: PETER GEORGE SIACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRIET SCHULMAN
Represented By: STEVEN M. PETRILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?