REISS v. PIRONE et al
Plaintiff: ELISABETH REISS
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, ANTONINO PIRONE, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10 and MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv21163
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B-D)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
January 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A-B)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
January 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(SANSONE, NICHOLAS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION for purposes of discovery and case management only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/22/2020. (tf, )
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Antonio Pirone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/16/2020. (tf, )
January 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/15/2020. (se, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER changing the initial conference to a telephone conference on 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/14/2020. (rtm, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Gaetano Mercogliano. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by ELISABETH REISS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(SANSONE, NICHOLAS)
December 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 03:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/9/2019. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/9/2019. (cry, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 6, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-3044-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10164583), filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REISS v. PIRONE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONINO PIRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GAETANO MERCOGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISABETH REISS
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. SANSONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?