REISS v. PIRONE et al
Plaintiff: ELISABETH REISS
Defendant: ANTONINO PIRONE, ABC CORPORATION(S) #1-10, JOHN DOES(S) 1-10, BOROUGH OF PRINCETON, MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY, ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY and MUNICIPALITY OF PRINCETON
Case Number: 1:2019cv21386
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(rtm, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SUSAN DEZII by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (rtm, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Merchant's Mutual Insurance Company to Answer the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/6/2020. (dmr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION for purposes of discovery and case management only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/22/2020. (tf, )
January 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 1/22/2020. (se, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received plaintiff's January 21, 2020 faxed letter, it is hereby ORDERED the initial in-person conference scheduled on January 22, 2020 is changed to a phone conference to be arranged by plaintiff's counsel. The Court also notes that no motion to remand has been filed in the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/21/20. (Schneider, Joel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY by STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY.(SMITH, JULIE)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Antonio Pirone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/16/2020. (tf, )
December 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 02:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/17/19. (cry, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/17/2019. (cry, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 16, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-3044-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10181172), filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REISS v. PIRONE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONINO PIRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF PRINCETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GAETANO MERCOGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: JULIE CAROLE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JULIE CAROLE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPALITY OF PRINCETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISABETH REISS
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. SANSONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?