AIGBEKAEN v. ORTIZ et al
Petitioner: RAYMOND AIGBEKAEN
Respondent: MS. RIVERA, AW SMITH, SOLICITOR GENERAL, BOP DIRECTOR, MR. JONES, WARDEN ORTIZ, D.H.O K. HAMILTON, MR. MORALES, LOILLIAN BARR and MR. ROBONSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv22115
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and send Petitioner blank IFP application and Habeas Petition forms; If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this order etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/13/2020. (cry, notice and forms mailed)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/13/2020. (cry, )
January 16, 2020 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re #4 Application to Proceed IFP filed on 01/15/2020 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (sgf)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RAYMOND AIGBEKAEN. (cry, )
December 31, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case; Directing the Clerk to supply Petitioner with a blank IFP form and and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus AO 242 form; If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case they shall notify the Court within 30 days from the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/31/2019. (cry, notice and forms mailed)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/31/2019. (cry, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RAYMOND AIGBEKAEN. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIGBEKAEN v. ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MS. RIVERA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AW SMITH
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SOLICITOR GENERAL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BOP DIRECTOR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MR. JONES
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.H.O K. HAMILTON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MR. MORALES
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LOILLIAN BARR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MR. ROBONSON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAYMOND AIGBEKAEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?