Estate of Larry Brock v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Brock
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY INC, DOES 1-100 and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
In Re: VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00224
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, )
January 7, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00538. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER transferring this case as part of MDL No. 2875 In Re: Valsartan Products Liability Litigation to the U.S. District Court District of New Jersey.. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel Karen K. Caldwell.(jak)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc (Simpson, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Adjourn the Initial Scheduling Order by Estate of Larry Brock. (Oliver, Alyson)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Golden State Medical Supply Inc. (Talley, Graham)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/3/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/17/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 11/2/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury demand by Golden State Medical Supply Inc.(Talley, Graham) (Docket text modified on 10/4/2019 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. will have fourteen days after the JPML's ruling on the motion to transfer and expand the scope of MDL 2875, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/24/19. (amr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc (Simpson, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Larry Brock. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 9/3/2019. (Oliver, Alyson)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Larry Brock. Golden State Medical Supply Inc served on 9/6/2019. (Oliver, Alyson)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Estate of Larry Brock. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073284.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Larry Brock v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY INC
Represented By: Graham Caughman Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Brock
Represented By: ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?