CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY v. ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant: ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00834
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (rss, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Default by CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY against Defendant Alliance National Insurance Company. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY of Summons & Complaint upon Alliance National Insurance Company c/o New Jersey Department of Banking and Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/28/20. (dd, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dd, )
January 24, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying North American Casualty Co. and AU Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10311764), filed by CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSATO, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY v. ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN MICHAEL ROSATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?