KEYES v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Plaintiff: KRISTINE KEYES
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (AS CLAIMED SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., U.S. BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, SHERIFF OF CAMDEN COUNTY, RAS CITRON LAW OFFICES, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and U.S. BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02649
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC re #16 MOTION to Remand and opposition to motions to dismiss (ARCURE, FRANCESCA)
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., U.S. BANK, N.A. re #16 MOTION to Remand and opposition to motions to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CATANZARO, STEPHEN)
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., U.S. BANK, N.A. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CATANZARO, STEPHEN)
April 15, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #16 MOTION to Remand and opposition to motions to dismiss. Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Note, #4 Exhibit Mortgage, #5 Exhibit Assignment, #6 Exhibit Assignment, #7 Exhibit Foreclosure Compl., #8 Exhibit Foreclosure Docket, #9 Exhibit Final Judg., #10 Exhibit Writ, #11 Exhibit Sheriffs Deed, #12 Exhibit Writ, #13 Exhibit Certification, #14 Exhibit Certification, #15 Exhibit Denied Order, #16 Exhibit Certification, #17 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket, #18 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket, #19 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket, #20 Exhibit Certification, #21 Exhibit Stay Relief Order, #22 Exhibit Cited Cases, #23 Certificate of Service)(BLAINE, MICHAEL)
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand and opposition to motions to dismiss by KRISTINE KEYES. (THOMAS, JOSHUA)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying BANA Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BLAINE on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A-G, #5 Exhibit H-K, #6 Exhibit L-O, #7 Exhibit P-R, #8 Certificate of Service)(ARCURE, FRANCESCA)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated March 27, 2020 from Joy Harmon Sperling, Esquire, counsel for defendants U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (U.S. Bank) and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS), and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to adjourn the in-person Initial Conference previously set for April 16, 2020, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is July 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/31/20. (nar)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Parties Jointly Requesting Adjournment of Initial Scheduling Conference re #2 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (SPERLING, JOY)
March 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 Certification of Service on behalf of MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., U.S. BANK, N.A. Re #9 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,. (CATANZARO, STEPHEN)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., U.S. BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Stephen R. Catanzaro, Esq., #3 Exhibit A to Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit B to Certification of Counsel, #5 Exhibit C to Certification of Counsel, #6 Exhibit D to Certification of Counsel, #7 Exhibit E to Certification of Counsel, #8 Exhibit F to Certification of Counsel, #9 Exhibit G to Certification of Counsel, #10 Exhibit H to Certification of Counsel, #11 Exhibit I to Certification of Counsel, #12 Exhibit J to Certification of Counsel, #13 Exhibit K to Certification of Counsel, #14 Exhibit L to Certification of Counsel, #15 Exhibit M to Certification of Counsel, #16 Exhibit N to Certification of Counsel, #17 Exhibit O to Certification of Counsel, #18 Exhibit P to Certification of Counsel, #19 Exhibit Q to Certification of Counsel, #20 Exhibit R to Certification of Counsel, #21 Exhibit S to Certification of Counsel, #22 Text of Proposed Order, #23 Certification of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. pursuant to L. Civ. R. 11.2, #24 Certification of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. pursuant to L. Civ. R. 11.2)(SPERLING, JOY)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. identifying MERS Corp. Holdings, Inc., which is owned by ICE Mortgage Services, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (SPERLING, JOY)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. BANK, N.A. identifying U.S. Bank National Association as Corporate Parent.. (SPERLING, JOY)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOY HARMON SPERLING on behalf of MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., U.S. BANK, N.A. (SPERLING, JOY)
March 19, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RAS CITRON LAW OFFICES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/31/2020. (rtm, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to RAS Citron, LLC. Attorney DAVID NEEREN for RAS CITRON LAW OFFICES added. (NEEREN, DAVID)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID NEEREN on behalf of RAS CITRON LAW OFFICES (NEEREN, DAVID)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC. (ARCURE, FRANCESCA)
March 12, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
March 12, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information,Removal-Other Court Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
March 12, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/12/2020. (cry, )
March 11, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-00669-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10537671), filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Law Division Complaint and Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARCURE, FRANCESCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEYES v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE KEYES
Represented By: JOSHUA LOUIS THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (AS CLAIMED SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.
Represented By: JOY HARMON SPERLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OF CAMDEN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS CITRON LAW OFFICES
Represented By: DAVID NEEREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By: FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: JOY HARMON SPERLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?