NATIONWIDE HOUSING MANAGEMENT LLC v. YRC FREIGHT
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE HOUSING MANAGEMENT LLC
Defendant: YRC FREIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv03044
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
2 Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/7/2020. (se, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Noel L. Hillman for all further proceedings. Judge Renee Marie Bumb no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/6/2020. (mmb, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Joseph S Caruso. (CARUSO, JOSEPH)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 It is hereby ORDERED a telephone settlement conference will take place on May 7, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The call in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. Prior to the call plaintiff shall produce all documents, photographs, and damage discovery to support its claim. Clients with FINAL authority to settle the case shall be on the call. It is further ORDERED all proceedings in the case are STAYED.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on April 15, 2020. (Shaw, A)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting letter request to convert the initial conference on 4/15/2020 at 10:30 a.m. to a telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/24/2020. (rss, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 4/15/2020 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/19/2020. (cry, )
March 19, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
March 19, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of YRC FREIGHT (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of YRC FREIGHT (MARTIN, THOMAS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC FREIGHT identifying Yes as Corporate Parent.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC FREIGHT from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-DC-1526-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10573024), filed by YRC FREIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE HOUSING MANAGEMENT LLC v. YRC FREIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC FREIGHT
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE HOUSING MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH S. CARUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?