OLSEN v. RATNER COMPANIES L.C. et al
Plaintiff: NICOLE OLSEN, CYNTHIA COLE, COURTNEY HOLLAND and JENNIFER CHANCEY
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10, DENNIS RATNER, PHIL HORVATH, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, RATNER COMPANIES d/b/a HAIR CUTTERY, BUBBLES THE COLOR SALON, CIBU, SALON CIELO, PAUL MITCHELL THE SCHOOL, SALON PLAZA and RATNER COMPANIES L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03760
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #21 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PHIL HORVATH has been DENIED. Answer due date has expired. (rss, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SPATARO, AMBER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA A. MASTROIANNI on behalf of DENNIS RATNER (MASTROIANNI, MARISSA)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED the Court will hold a telephone status conference on June 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The call in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790# The purpose of the call is to address the parties recent letters. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/21/20. (Shaw, A)
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Amber Spataro in response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing. (SPATARO, AMBER)
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Plaintiffs' attorney, Adam S. Malamut re #12 Brief. (MALAMUT, ADAM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from Amber Spataro opposing Plaintiff's extension request. (SPATARO, AMBER)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Randi W. Kochman, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(KOCHMAN, RANDI)
May 18, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter #14 filed by RANDI W. KOCHMAN on 5/15/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document using event LETTER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by DENNIS RATNER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(KOCHMAN, RANDI)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF on Behalf of All Plaintiff's in response to the Courts April 30, 2020 Order (MALAMUT, ADAM)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF on behalf of Mr. Horvath in response to this Courts April 30, 2020 Order [ECF 11] (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(SPATARO, AMBER)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. The Court having received the filed Suggestion of Bankruptcy [Doc. No. 10], it is hereby ORDERED the parties may file letter briefs by May 15, 2020 as to whether the entire case should be stayed or if the stay should be entered as to less than all filing parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/30/20. (Schneider, Joel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Ratner Companies, L.C. by BUBBLES THE COLOR SALON, CIBU, PHIL HORVATH, PAUL MITCHELL THE SCHOOL, RATNER COMPANIES L.C., SALON CIELO, SALON PLAZA. (SPATARO, AMBER)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER M. SPATARO on behalf of BUBBLES THE COLOR SALON, CIBU, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, PHIL HORVATH, PAUL MITCHELL THE SCHOOL, RATNER COMPANIES L.C., SALON CIELO, SALON PLAZA (SPATARO, AMBER)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NICOLE OLSEN, Courtney Holland, CYNTHIA COLE, Jennifer Chancey.(MALAMUT, ADAM)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NICOLE OLSEN.(MALAMUT, ADAM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORP. 1-10, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, PHIL HORVATH, DENNIS RATNER, RATNER COMPANIES L.C., filed by NICOLE OLSEN.(MALAMUT, ADAM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM S. MALAMUT on behalf of NICOLE OLSEN (MALAMUT, ADAM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NICOLE OLSEN. Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (CRUZ, PRIMITIVO)
April 8, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT #1 submitted by NICOLE OLSEN on 4/7/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (cry, )
April 8, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHIL HORVATH, DENNIS RATNER, RATNER COMPANIES L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NICOLE OLSEN. Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (CRUZ, PRIMITIVO)
April 7, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORP. 1-10, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, PHIL HORVATH, DENNIS RATNER, RATNER COMPANIES d/b/a HAIR CUTTERY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10654728) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NICOLE OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(CRUZ, PRIMITIVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSEN v. RATNER COMPANIES L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS RATNER
Represented By: MARISSA A. MASTROIANNI
Represented By: RANDI W. KOCHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL HORVATH
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RATNER COMPANIES d/b/a HAIR CUTTERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUBBLES THE COLOR SALON
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBU
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALON CIELO
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MITCHELL THE SCHOOL
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALON PLAZA
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RATNER COMPANIES L.C.
Represented By: AMBER M. SPATARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE OLSEN
Represented By: PRIMITIVO JOSEPH CRUZ
Represented By: ADAM S. MALAMUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA COLE
Represented By: ADAM S. MALAMUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY HOLLAND
Represented By: ADAM S. MALAMUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER CHANCEY
Represented By: ADAM S. MALAMUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?