LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC et al v. KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC and LEVARI TRUCKING CO., LLC
Defendant: CHALMERS SUSPENSIONS INTERNATIONAL, INC., KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, XYZ COMPANIES 11-20, PACCAR INC., GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, XYZ COMPANIES 1-10 and GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06210
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (PACCAR Inc. Kenworth Truck Company, and Gabrielli Kenworth of NJ, LLC).. (LALLIS, DANNY)
July 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC, KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/23/2020. (rss, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC, LEVARI TRUCKING CO., LLC. (WHITE, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHALMERS SUSPENSIONS INTERNATIONAL, INC., GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC, KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC., XYZ COMPANIES 1-10, XYZ COMPANIES 11-20, filed by LEVARI TRUCKING CO., LLC, LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC.(WHITE, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC, LEVARI TRUCKING CO., LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (WHITE, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 25, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC, KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Counsel in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Limited Warranty (VIN No. 1NKZXPTX6GJ105715), #4 Exhibit B - Limited Warranty (VIN No. 1NKZXPTX6GJ105720 & 1NKZXPTX6GJ105721), #5 Exhibit C - Limited Warranty (VIN No. 1NKZXPTX6GJ105723 & 1NKZXPTX6GJ105724), #6 Exhibit D - Limited Warranty (VIN No. 1NKZXPTX8FJ434947), #7 Exhibit E - Limited Warranty (VIN No. 1NKZXPTX1FJ434949), #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(LALLIS, DANNY)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, the telephonic initial scheduling conference on 6/16/2020 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 7/21/2020 at 2:00 P.M. The parties shall utilize the same dial-in information as previously provided by the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/15/2020. (slc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Justin R. White. (WHITE, JUSTIN)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 6/16/2020 at 11:00 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. The parties shall utilize the following dial-in information: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/11/2020. (slc)
June 10, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC, KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/24/2020. (rss, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants PACCAR Inc, Kenworth Truck Company, and Gabrielli Kenworth of NJ, LLC. Attorney DANNY CHARLES LALLIS for GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC added. (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC, KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Order to Show Cause . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(LALLIS, DANNY)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC of Appearance and Consent to Removal (LALLIS, DANNY)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD MARK LANEY on behalf of KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC. (LANEY, CLIFFORD)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Directing Defendants fifteen (15) days to amend their notice of removal, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/26/2020. (rss, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI on behalf of PACCAR INC. (PISCIOTTI, ANTHONY)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 6/16/2020 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/22/2020. (cry, )
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/22/2020. (cry, )
May 21, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN ROBERT WHITE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WHITE, JUSTIN)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC.. (LALLIS, DANNY)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC. from Superior Court of Cumberland County, case number CUM-L-000318-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10843956), filed by KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, PACCAR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(LALLIS, DANNY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC et al v. KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHALMERS SUSPENSIONS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Represented By: CLIFFORD MARK LANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANIES 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR INC.
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Represented By: ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI
Represented By: CLIFFORD MARK LANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NJ, LLC
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVARI ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: JUSTIN ROBERT WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVARI TRUCKING CO., LLC
Represented By: JUSTIN ROBERT WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?