ARCHIE et al v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN ARCHIE, SR., RAYMOND LAMAR BROWN, JOHN CLARK, JEFFREY PAGLIONE, DESMOND RODGERS, PHILLIP GAULT, JR., KAMAL MARTIN and TODD FORD, JR.
Defendant: JODY HIRATA, RICHARD SMITH and CHARLES WARREN
Interested Party: TARA D. SIMMONS-ARCHIE
Case Number: 1:2020cv07907
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to PHILLIP GAULT, JR. (cry, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JOHN CLARK. (pr, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JEFFREY PAGLIONE. (cry, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from TARA D. SIMMONS-ARCHIE addressed to Judge Hillman re: Power of Attorney. (dmr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by DESMOND RODGERS. (pr, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RAYMOND LAMAR BROWN. (pr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from SHAWN ARCHIE, SR. (cry, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from TODD FORD, JR. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 COMPLAINT against JODY HIRATA, RICHARD SMITH, CHARLES WARREN, filed by JEFFREY PAGLIONE, TODD FORD, JR, RAYMOND LAMAR BROWN, JOHN CLARK, SHAWN ARCHIE, SR, DESMOND RODGERS, KAMAL MARTIN, PHILLIP GAULT, JR. See #1 for docs(rss, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing the complaint to proceed; Directing Clerk to select an attorney from the civil pro bono panel, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/16/2020. (rss, n.m.)
July 14, 2020 Filing fee received from KAMAL MARTIN: $ 400, receipt number CAM11504 (dd, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from SHAWN ARCHIE, SR. (dmr)
July 10, 2020 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re #4 Letter filed on 07/08/2020 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (dpw)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from JOHN CLARK requesting to proceed in forma pauperis. (cry, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from SHAWN ARCHIE, SR. requesting to reopen this case. (gn )
July 1, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Plaintiffs with a blank IFP application; If Plaintiffs wish to reopen this case they shall notify the court in writing with 30 days of the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/30/2020. (cry, notice and IFP's mailed)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/30/2020. (cry, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCHIE et al v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY HIRATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN ARCHIE, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND LAMAR BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY PAGLIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESMOND RODGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP GAULT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMAL MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD FORD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TARA D. SIMMONS-ARCHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?