VALERIO v. BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CAMILO ANTONIO GARCIA VALERIO
Defendant: XPO LAST MILE, INC., BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC, MIKE SKIRVIN, KARL L. MEYER, JANE & JOHN DOES 1-10, KARL MEYER and ABC CORPS. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv08536
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC. (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DUVOL M. THOMPSON on behalf of BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC, MIKE SKIRVIN (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN W. ARON on behalf of XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Statement Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint)(ARON, MARTIN)
July 10, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC, KARL MEYER, MIKE SKIRVIN, XPO LAST MILE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/10/2020. (cry, )
July 9, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by CAMILO ANTONIO GARCIA VALERIO as to XPO LAST MILE, INC.. (SATTIRAJU, RAVI)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by CAMILO ANTONIO GARCIA VALERIO as to BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC. (SATTIRAJU, RAVI)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC, XPO LAST MILE, INC., MIKE SKIRVIN, KARL L. MEYER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11052143) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CAMILO ANTONIO GARCIA VALERIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(SATTIRAJU, RAVI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALERIO v. BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO LAST MILE, INC.
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC
Represented By: DUVOL M. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE SKIRVIN
Represented By: DUVOL M. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL L. MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE & JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMILO ANTONIO GARCIA VALERIO
Represented By: ANTHONY SANTOS ALMEIDA
Represented By: RAVI SATTIRAJU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?