CARATINI v. POWELL et al
Plaintiff: PETER L. CARATINI
Defendant: DAVID METELOW, ASST. SUPERINTENDENT LISA SWIFT, SCO. APRIL WASHINGTON, CINDY SWEENEY, WILLIE BONDS, MAHMOND EL DEKKI, SCO. COLON, SCO. OSBORNE, P. SHEPPARD, SCO. L. VASTANO, SCO. R. SEENEY, NURSE PRACTITIONER LISA R. MILLS, SCO. J. KUHLEN, SCO. A. DOOLEY, SCO. S. HUNTER, JILL TANNER, OLIVER KELLER, SCO. A. HERNANDEZ, ADMINISTRATOR JOHN POWELL and SCO. D. SHEEHAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv08924
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to submit a properly (1) completed IFP application and (2) an amended complaint, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/14/2020. (rss, n.m.)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Letter request to reopen case from PETER L. CARATINI. (rss, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM & ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Plaintiff with a blank IFP application and Civil Rights complaint forms; If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/17/2020. (cry, notice and forms mailed)
July 17, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03048. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
July 7, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #4 ON 7/7/20. (jaa, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/25/20. 6/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by PETER L. CARATINI..(bw, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/24/2020) (bw, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against WILLIE BONDS, MAHMOND EL DEKKI, OLIVER KELLER, DAVID METELOW, LISA R. MILLS, P. SHEPPARD, JOHN POWELL, SCO. A. DOOLEY, SCO. A. HERNANDEZ, SCO. COLON, SCO. D. SHEEHAN, SCO. J. KUHLEN, SCO. L. VASTANO, SCO. OSBORNE, SCO. R. SEENEY, SCO. S. HUNTER, CINDY SWEENEY, LISA SWIFT, JILL TANNER, APRIL WASHINGTON, filed by PETER L. CARATINI. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by PETER L. CARATINI..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARATINI v. POWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID METELOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASST. SUPERINTENDENT LISA SWIFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. APRIL WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIE BONDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHMOND EL DEKKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. SHEPPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. L. VASTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. R. SEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE PRACTITIONER LISA R. MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. J. KUHLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. A. DOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. S. HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVER KELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. A. HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATOR JOHN POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO. D. SHEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER L. CARATINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?