PETRE v. ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE PETRE
Defendant: ATLAS HEALTHCARE, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER, ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC doing business as ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL and PHILLIP BAK
Case Number: 1:2020cv09002
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE PETRE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BURKE, CHRISTINE)
August 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LAURA MCLANE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura McLane to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
August 18, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Laura McLane: $ 150, receipt number CAM11581 (tf, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laura McLane; shall make payment of $150.00 on admission payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/12/2020. (tf, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 12/1/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/11/2020. (tf, )
August 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 8/11/2020. (sb)
August 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura McLane on behalf of defendants (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura McLane on behalf of defendants. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CERTIFICATION OF LAURA MCLANE [8-2] submitted by Richard Scharlat on 7/27/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATION ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura McLane on behalf of defendants by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Richard I. Scharlat in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Laura McLane in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 8/11/2020 at 10:30 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in information for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/23/2020. (slc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER.(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, COOPER CARE, LLC, PHILLIP BAK, ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER, ATLAS HEALTHCARE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/6/2020. (tf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Edited Text, page 2. by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE, LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER. (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, Defendants added to the docket do not reflect the alias information listed in the caption of the complaint. In the future please make sure to add all information as represented in the caption. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 8/11/2020 10:30 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/16/2020. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, D/B/A ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ATLAS HEALTHCARE, PHILLIP BAK, COOPER CARE LLC, SAM GOLDBERGER, ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER identifying Cooper Care Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, COOPER CARE LLC, PHILLIP BAK, ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, D/B/A ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, SAM GOLDBERGER, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER, ATLAS HEALTHCARE from Superior Court of Camden County, NJ, case number CAM-L-2121-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084688), filed by ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL, COOPER CARE LLC, PHILLIP BAK, ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC, D/B/A ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, SAM GOLDBERGER, RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER, ATLAS HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETRE v. ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS HEALTHCARE
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER CARE, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM GOLDBERGER
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERFRONT REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CARE CENTER
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC doing business as ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTEFFANY PENAFIEL
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP BAK
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE PETRE
Represented By: CHRISTINE ELAINE BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?