WILCOX et al v. SMITH
Plaintiff: MELISSA WILCOX and RICHARD WILCOX
Defendant: MATTHEW SMITH
Case Number: 1:2020cv09005
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/31/2020. (dmr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference currently scheduled for September 2, 2020 is hereby moved to October 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in and access code remain unchanged. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/27/20. (Shaw, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial conference scheduled on September 2, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/21/20. (Shaw, A).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 03:30 PM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/7/2020. (tf, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MATTHEW SMITH.(READY, COLLEEN)
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATTHEW SMITH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084830) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD WILCOX, MELISSA WILCOX.(BLAKE, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILCOX et al v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA WILCOX
Represented By: KEVIN M. BLAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WILCOX
Represented By: KEVIN M. BLAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SMITH
Represented By: COLLEEN M. READY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?