MOFFITT et al v. WAL-MART, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MOFFITT and CATHERINE MOFFITT
Defendant: JOHN DOE PRODUCT SELLER AND/OR MERCHANDISING COMPANY, WALMART, INC., JOHN DOE INDIVIDUAL(S) (1-10), JOHN ROE CLEANING/MAINTENANCE COMPANY and Advantage Sales, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10691
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advantage Sales, LLC, filed by CATHERINE MOFFITT.(HASNER, LOUIS)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint; Plaintiffs shall file the amended complaint within ten (10) days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/14/2020. (tf, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Sharlenn E. Pratt, Esquire. (PRATT, SHARLENN)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Defense counsel shall advise the Court by no later than 10/14/2020 as to whether Defendant will be filing any opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to amend. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/8/2020. (slc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Certification on behalf of CATHERINE MOFFITT Re #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. (HASNER, LOUIS)
October 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 6, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certificate of Service submitted by Louis Hasner on 10/6/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Certificate of Service only WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct by CATHERINE MOFFITT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed amended complaint)(HASNER, LOUIS)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend thepleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 11/16/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/30/2021. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in July 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2020. (tf, )
September 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 9/22/2020. (sb)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE: The initial scheduling conference on 9/22/2020 at 10:00 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. (slc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART, INC..(PRATT, SHARLENN)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Affirmative Defenses by WALMART, INC..(PRATT, SHARLENN)
August 18, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 9/22/2020 10:00 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 08/18/2020. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. RMB #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. identifying Walmart Stores East, L.P. as Corporate Parent.. (PRATT, SHARLENN)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. from Superior Court of Burlington County, case number BUR-L-001412-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11223924), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(PRATT, SHARLENN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOFFITT et al v. WAL-MART, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PRODUCT SELLER AND/OR MERCHANDISING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: SHARLENN E. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE INDIVIDUAL(S) (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROE CLEANING/MAINTENANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MOFFITT
Represented By: DAVID LOUIS HASNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE MOFFITT
Represented By: DAVID LOUIS HASNER
Represented By: LOUIS GEORGE HASNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?